+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (2)
On December 6, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Primary and Secondary Education
On December 4, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (5)
+ − Votes (3)
November 29, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 3
November 15, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
May 24, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (105)
Type:
Primary Sponsor