+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Reported - Amended
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Informally passed
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Reported
On September 19, 2017 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On September 12, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor