+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 22, 2015 in the House:
- Effective 12/22/15
On December 9, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On December 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported - Substitute
On November 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On October 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On October 27, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
On October 19, 2015 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute
On October 1, 2015 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On September 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor