+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date: March 26, 2013
- Governor's action
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Concurrence
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Commerce & Labor
- Received in Senate
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Substituted
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Finance and Appropriations
- Introduced
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2013: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 33
February 28, 2013: Bill Passed (Vote)
- Yeas: 97
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor