+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On November 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Judiciary
On July 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 26, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On June 25, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Criminal Justice
On November 28, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Criminal Justice
On November 14, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Votes (10)
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 2
June 25, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
April 24, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
June 27, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
June 21, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 28
June 14, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
June 24, 2021: Passed
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 3
June 16, 2021: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
May 6, 2021: Passed
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 17
May 3, 2021: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (82)
Type:
Primary Sponsor