+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee General Government
On June 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 12, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On May 22, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Commerce and Labor
On November 14, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Commerce and Labor
On November 13, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (4)
+ − Votes (3)
June 12, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 6
May 22, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
December 6, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsors (125)
Type:
Primary Sponsor