+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (5)
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Veterans and Public Safety
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Passed
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Government Oversight
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to committee Government Oversight
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (58)
Type:
Primary Sponsor