+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Ways and Means
On February 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 7, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Amended Insurance
- Passed
On November 14, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Ways and Means
On November 8, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (5)
February 7, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 15
November 15, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
October 3, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
June 21, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
March 1, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (117)
Type:
Primary Sponsor