+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On September 4, 2012 in the House:
- Effective date: September 4, 2012
On June 4, 2012 in the House:
- Governor's action
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 22, 2012 in the House:
- Concurrence
On May 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd consideration
- Committee report: Substituted
On March 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions
- Received in Senate
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Committee report
On September 13, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions, Housing & Urban Development
- Introduced
+ − Votes (3)
May 22, 2012: Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 30
May 16, 2012: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 14
March 28, 2012: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 31