+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (3)
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Transportation
On November 14, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Transportation
On November 8, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Votes (11)
June 17, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
April 24, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
February 28, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
December 13, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 1
December 6, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 19
December 6, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
November 2, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 2
May 24, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 1
May 8, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
March 29, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
February 22, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsors (120)
Type:
Primary Sponsor