+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (11)
On December 19, 2024 in the House:
- Signed By The Governor
On December 17, 2024 in the House:
- Sent To The Governor
On December 11, 2024 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On December 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Passed
On December 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute Energy and Public Utilities
On November 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Energy and Public Utilities
On July 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 26, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Energy and Natural Resources
On October 31, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Energy and Natural Resources
On October 24, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (13)
December 11, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 26
December 11, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 6
December 10, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 10
May 8, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
April 24, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
May 10, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 7
May 10, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 37
May 9, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
May 2, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 6
April 19, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
March 8, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 7
March 1, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (124)
Type:
Primary Sponsor