+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee General Government
On May 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On May 22, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute State and Local Government
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee State and Local Government
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (5)
+ − Votes (8)
June 12, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
May 22, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 92
April 24, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 15
February 28, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 4
January 10, 2024: Adopted
- Yeas: 28
June 28, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 7
June 7, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
March 1, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor