+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On December 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute
On September 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 20, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute
On September 12, 2017 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor