+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Effective 4/6/17
On December 8, 2016 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On December 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Passed
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute
On October 1, 2015 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On July 16, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (79)
Type:
Primary Sponsor