+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 30, 2024 in the House:
- Sent To The Governor
On December 18, 2024 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On December 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute Judiciary
- Passed
On December 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Judiciary
On December 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 6, 2023 in the House:
- Passed
On May 10, 2023 in the House:
- Reported - Amended Homeland Security
On April 25, 2023 in the House:
- Reported - Re-referred to Homeland Security Rules and Reference
On April 18, 2023 in the House:
- Re-referred Rules and Reference
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- Reported - Amended Homeland Security
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Homeland Security
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Fiscal Notes (5)
+ − Votes (11)
December 18, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 6
December 18, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 6
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 1
June 26, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
December 13, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 6
December 6, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 84
October 18, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
May 24, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
May 10, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
April 25, 2023: Re-referred
- Yeas: 11
March 23, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (128)
Type:
Primary Sponsor