+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (11)
On December 19, 2024 in the House:
- Signed By The Governor
On December 17, 2024 in the House:
- Sent To The Governor
On December 11, 2024 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On December 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute Judiciary
- Passed
On June 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Judiciary
On June 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 12, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On June 10, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Criminal Justice
On October 3, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Criminal Justice
On October 2, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (4)
+ − Votes (8)
December 11, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 1
December 11, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
June 12, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 1
June 10, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
June 7, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 31
May 31, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
May 24, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 89
May 10, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (127)
Type:
Primary Sponsor