+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (4)
On December 3, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Re-referred to Finance Rules and Reference
On November 20, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute - Re-referred to Rules and Reference Transportation
On September 26, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Transportation
On September 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (4)
December 3, 2024: Re-referred
- Yeas: 12
November 20, 2024: Re-referred
- Yeas: 15
April 24, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 2
April 10, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (85)
Type:
Primary Sponsor