+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 30, 2024 in the House:
- Sent To The Governor
On December 18, 2024 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On December 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute Judiciary
- Passed
On May 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Judiciary
On May 14, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On April 10, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Civil Justice
On September 26, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Civil Justice
On September 12, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (4)
December 18, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 90
December 18, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 6
May 8, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 89
April 10, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsors (124)
Type:
Primary Sponsor