+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 2, 2018 in the House:
- Effective 11/2/18
On July 24, 2018 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On July 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported - Amended
On December 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On December 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 5, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
On October 26, 2017 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (89)
Type:
Primary Sponsor