+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On January 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Veterans and Public Safety
On December 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 13, 2023 in the House:
- Passed
On October 30, 2023 in the House:
- Reported - Amended Homeland Security
On September 12, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Homeland Security
On July 11, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (6)
April 24, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 2
January 10, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
December 13, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 91
October 30, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
June 28, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 32
June 6, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (113)
Type:
Primary Sponsor