+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On November 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Insurance
On July 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 26, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On June 17, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Insurance
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Insurance
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 17
June 17, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (69)
Type:
Primary Sponsor