+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (3)
On June 10, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Homeland Security
On September 12, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Homeland Security
On June 29, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (10)
June 10, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
December 6, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
October 11, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7
June 27, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 95
June 21, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 3
June 20, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
June 7, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 17
May 31, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 32
May 30, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
January 3, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 52
+ − Sponsors (126)
Type:
Primary Sponsor