+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 15, 2024 in the House:
- Sent To The Governor
On June 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Passed
On June 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Energy and Public Utilities
On February 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Energy and Public Utilities
On February 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 7, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On January 29, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Public Utilities
On September 12, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Public Utilities
On June 26, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (7)
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 31
June 25, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
February 7, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 15
January 29, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
October 11, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
June 21, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 3
February 22, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsors (114)
Type:
Primary Sponsor