+ − Full Texts (17)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 6, 2020 in the House:
- Effective 1/29/21
On September 23, 2020 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On September 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported - Amended Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Transportation and Public Safety
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Refer to Committee Transportation and Public Safety
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor