+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 15, 2024 in the House:
- Sent To The Governor
On June 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Transportation
- Passed
On December 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Transportation
On December 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 6, 2023 in the House:
- Passed
On June 14, 2023 in the House:
- Reported Transportation
On June 7, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Transportation
On June 6, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (12)
June 26, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 21
June 20, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
December 6, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 89
December 6, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
June 21, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 8
June 14, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
June 13, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
May 24, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 89
May 10, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 66
April 19, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
January 24, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 34
+ − Sponsors (133)
Type:
Primary Sponsor