+ − Effective Date
- May 17, 2021
+ − Full Texts (18)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Effective 5-17-2021
- Signed By The Governor
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Sent To The Governor
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported - Amended Financial Institutions and Technology
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Financial Institutions and Technology
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Reported - Amended Finance
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to committee Finance
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (111)
Type:
Primary Sponsor