+ − Effective Date
- January 11, 2024
+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 28, 2024 in the House:
- Signed By The Governor
- Emergency Act
On June 26, 2024 in the House:
- Sent To The Governor
On June 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Passed
On June 26, 2024 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On June 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute Finance
On April 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Finance
On February 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 7, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Finance
- Passed
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Finance
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Fiscal Notes (5)
+ − Votes (10)
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 5
June 26, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
February 7, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 32
January 10, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 5
December 6, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 6
November 15, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
November 15, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 30
November 14, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 6
October 11, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
January 3, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 7
+ − Sponsors (126)
Type:
Primary Sponsor