+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On October 7, 2015 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to
On October 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to
On September 30, 2015 in the House:
- Conference managers: Reps. - Hayes, Amstutz, Fedor
On September 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Insist on amendments; asks for committee of conference
On September 30, 2015 in the House:
- Refused to concur in Senate amendments
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported - Substitute
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor