+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 29, 2018 in the House:
- Effective 6/29/18
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported - Substitute
On November 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On October 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On October 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Reported
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (91)
Representative Johnson
Type:
Primary Sponsor