+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (11)
On December 19, 2024 in the House:
- Signed By The Governor
On December 17, 2024 in the House:
- Sent To The Governor
On December 10, 2024 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On December 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported - Amended Government Oversight
- Passed
On January 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Government Oversight
On January 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 10, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On November 15, 2023 in the House:
- Reported State and Local Government
On June 7, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee State and Local Government
On May 23, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (6)
December 10, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 1
December 4, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
January 10, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 5
November 15, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
October 11, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
September 13, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (131)
Type:
Primary Sponsor