+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Education
On June 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 12, 2024 in the House:
- Passed - Amended
On June 10, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Amended Civil Justice
On May 23, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Civil Justice
On May 22, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Fiscal Notes (6)
+ − Votes (6)
June 12, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 8
June 10, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
April 24, 2024: Adopted
- Yeas: 32
April 23, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
January 18, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
November 15, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (89)
Type:
Primary Sponsor