+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (5)
On November 16, 2023 in the House:
- Reported Public Health Policy
On June 13, 2023 in the House:
- Reported - Re-referred to Public Health Policy Rules and Reference
On June 7, 2023 in the House:
- Recalled to Rules and Reference Rules and Reference
On May 23, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Insurance
On May 22, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (5)
December 6, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 90
November 16, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
June 13, 2023: Re-referred
- Yeas: 12
March 1, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
March 1, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (128)
Type:
Primary Sponsor