+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Effective 3/23/18
On December 13, 2017 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On December 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed
On November 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor