+ − Full Texts (18)
+ − Actions (9)
On October 23, 2020 in the House:
- Effective 1/15/21
On September 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed
On September 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Ways and Means
On December 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee Ways and Means
On November 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 19, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
On November 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reported - Amended Ways and Means
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Refer to Committee Ways and Means
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (91)
Type:
Primary Sponsor