+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (11)
On October 29, 2018 in the House:
- Effective 10/29/18Appropriations effective July 30, 2018
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported
On November 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On October 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On October 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
On September 21, 2017 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred
- Re-referred - Amended
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor