+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (2)
On May 9, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Ways and Means
On May 8, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analysis
+ − Fiscal Note
+ − Votes (5)
April 24, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
December 6, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 89
November 15, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
June 21, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
June 14, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (113)
Type:
Primary Sponsor