+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Effective 5/11/18
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported - Amended
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (62)
Type:
Primary Sponsor