+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Finance
On June 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 12, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On May 22, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Amended Finance
On June 20, 2023 in the House:
- Reported - Re-referred to Finance Rules and Reference
On June 13, 2023 in the House:
- Reported - Re-referred to Rules and Reference Higher Education
On May 2, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Higher Education
On May 1, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Fiscal Notes (4)
+ − Votes (7)
June 12, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 5
May 22, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
June 20, 2023: Re-referred
- Yeas: 11
June 13, 2023: Re-referred
- Yeas: 12
April 19, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 27
March 8, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 4
February 8, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 30
+ − Sponsors (127)
Type:
Primary Sponsor