+ − Effective Date
- June 13, 2022
+ − Full Texts (18)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 13, 2022 in the House:
- Effective 6-13-2022
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Signed By The Governor
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Sent To The Governor
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Veterans and Public Safety
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Veterans and Public Safety
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Commerce and Labor
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to committee Commerce and Labor
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (75)
Type:
Primary Sponsor