+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (2)
On May 2, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Insurance
On April 25, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (7)
May 8, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 1
April 23, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
June 28, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 32
June 21, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
June 14, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 17
June 6, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
May 24, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 87
+ − Sponsors (112)
Type:
Primary Sponsor