+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On December 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 29, 2016 in the House:
- Passed
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor