+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Effective 3/23/16
On December 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed
On October 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (81)
Type:
Primary Sponsor