+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: February 14, 2014
On November 15, 2013 in the House:
- Governor's action
On November 14, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On November 6, 2013 in the House:
- Concurrence
On November 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On October 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: State Government Oversight & Reform
- Received in Senate
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: State and Local Government
- Introduced
+ − Votes (2)
November 6, 2013: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 33
June 18, 2013: Bill Passed (Vote)
- Yeas: 93
+ − Sponsors (82)
Type:
Primary Sponsor