+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On January 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Insurance
On December 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 13, 2023 in the House:
- Passed
On November 2, 2023 in the House:
- Reported Insurance
On April 18, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Insurance
On March 28, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (5)
December 13, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 8
December 13, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
November 2, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
June 21, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 4
May 10, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsors (108)
Type:
Primary Sponsor