+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (2)
On April 18, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Ways and Means
On March 28, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analysis
+ − Fiscal Note
+ − Votes (3)
March 22, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
February 8, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 30
May 18, 2021: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (124)
Type:
Primary Sponsor