+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On November 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 17, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
On October 19, 2015 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute
On September 16, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Informally passed
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor