+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
- Reported - Substitute
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred
On May 29, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred - Substitute
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor