+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: March 20, 2014
On December 19, 2013 in the House:
- Governor's action
On December 12, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On November 20, 2013 in the House:
- Concurrence
On November 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On November 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Civil Justice
- Received in Senate
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Substituted
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Introduced
+ − Votes (2)
November 20, 2013: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 33
June 12, 2013: Bill Passed (Vote)
- Yeas: 95
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor