+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On October 29, 2018 in the House:
- Effective 10/29/18
On July 24, 2018 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On July 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported - Substitute
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On June 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Reported
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor