+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 25, 2011 in the House:
- Effective date note: Codified provisions effective 07/29/11
- Governor's action
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Concurrence
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd consideration
- Committee report: Substituted
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Insurance, Commerce, & Labor
- Received in Senate
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: *Finance & Appropriations
- Introduced
+ − Votes (4)
April 13, 2011: Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 3
April 6, 2011: Motion to Table Amendment
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 5
April 6, 2011: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 4
March 23, 2011: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 96